KS HB2111 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for food and food ingredients, providing a sales tax exemption for children's diapers and feminine hygiene products, establishing the STAR bonds food sales tax revenue replacement fund, altering the calculation for STAR bond districts and discontinuing the food sales income tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for food and food ingredients, providing a sales tax exemption for children's diapers and feminine hygiene products, establishing the STAR bonds food sales tax revenue replacement fund, altering the calculation for STAR bond districts and discontinuing the food sales income tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2023-02-07HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2023-01-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2023-01-19HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback