KS HB2111 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code of civil procedure; items allowable as costs.
Title
Code of civil procedure; items allowable as costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 12 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 12 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015 |
2015-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 08, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, May 01 , 2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 5 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2015-03-31 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Macheers and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-12 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 12 |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 03, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |