KS HB2109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the state board of regents to sell, exchange and convey certain real property in Riley county and Sedgwick county on behalf of Kansas state university and Wichita state university.
Title
Authorizing the state board of regents to sell, exchange and convey certain real property in Riley county and Sedgwick county on behalf of Kansas state university and Wichita state university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 104 Nay: 19 (Y: 104 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 104 Nay: 19 (Y: 104 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 24, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-09 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 104 Nay: 19 |
2017-02-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |