KS HB2108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to the grandparents as caregivers act.
Title
Amendments to the grandparents as caregivers act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELLED |
2017-01-24 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2108/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2108_00_0000.pdf |