KS HB2104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2104 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Extending certain budget due dates for schools and notice and hearing requirements when exceeding the revenue neutral rate for property tax purposes, changing time to request full and complete opinion from the state board tax appeals, requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party, prohibiting valuation increases of certain property in appeals, requiring appraisal directives to require compliance with uniform standards of professional appraisal practice, providing for notice and opportunity to be heard prior to removal from county appraiser eligibility list, providing notification when person no longer holds office of county appraiser, placing the burden of proof on the county appraiser in certain valuation and classification appeal hearings before the district court, requiring appraisal courses for appraisers to be courses approved by the Kansas real estate appraisal board, extending the time a state board of tax appeals member may continue to serve after such member's term expires and authorizing appointment of a member pro tempore under certain conditions.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2104 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Extending certain budget due dates for schools and notice and hearing requirements when exceeding the revenue neutral rate for property tax purposes, changing time to request full and complete opinion from the state board tax appeals, requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party, prohibiting valuation increases of certain property in appeals, requiring appraisal directives to require compliance with uniform standards of professional appraisal practice, providing for notice and opportunity to be heard prior to removal from county appraiser eligibility list, providing notification when person no longer holds office of county appraiser, placing the burden of proof on the county appraiser in certain valuation and classification appeal hearings before the district court, requiring appraisal courses for appraisers to be courses approved by the Kansas real estate appraisal board, extending the time a state board of tax appeals member may continue to serve after such member's term expires and authorizing appointment of a member pro tempore under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 77 Nay: 42 (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, April 7, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 77 Nay: 42 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 14 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Alley and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2021-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Mason and Representative Gartner as conferees |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 8 |
2021-02-18 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 17, 2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |