KS HB2104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments related to driving under the influence, including preliminary screening tests, implied consent advisories and test refusal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments related to driving under the influence, including preliminary screening tests, implied consent advisories and test refusal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-02HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
2019-02-21HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 20, 2019
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-20HouseHouse Representative Ralph raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-01-30HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback