KS HB2104 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; filling vacancies of nominations.
Title
Elections; filling vacancies of nominations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 64 Nay: 58 (Y: 64 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 22 Nay: 13 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 69 Nay: 54 (Y: 69 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 22 Nay: 13 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 69 Nay: 54 (Y: 69 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, May 22 , 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 64 Nay: 58 |
2015-05-14 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 22 Nay: 13 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Kahrs, Representative Esau and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Holmes, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Holmes, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2015-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kahrs , Representative Esau and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 69 Nay: 54 |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 281N |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |