KS HB2103 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating bridge no. 14 (030) in Clay county as the Clay county Vietnam veterans bridge.
Title
Designating bridge no. 14 (030) in Clay county as the Clay county Vietnam veterans bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 03, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 05, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |