KS HB2103 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales taxation; presumptions relating to nexus.
Title
Sales taxation; presumptions relating to nexus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2103/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2103_00_0000.pdf |