KS HB2102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of county commissioners; meetings; regional library system board appointments.
Title
Board of county commissioners; meetings; regional library system board appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2017-04-04 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |