KS HB2098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a court to change a spouse's name to a name that is different than a maiden or former name during a divorce proceeding.
Title
Allowing a court to change a spouse's name to a name that is different than a maiden or former name during a divorce proceeding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |