KS HB2097 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decoupling the KIT and KIR workforce training programs from the high performance incentive fund program.
Title
Decoupling the KIT and KIR workforce training programs from the high performance incentive fund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 25, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |