KS HB2097 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing method for calculating cost of keeping civil prisoners in county jail.
Title
Providing method for calculating cost of keeping civil prisoners in county jail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 116 Nay: 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | House Introduced |