KS HB2090 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2090 by Committee on Transportation - Relating to motor vehicle registration, apportioned registration for fleet vehicles, decal serial numbers and annual registration.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2090 by Committee on Transportation - Relating to motor vehicle registration, apportioned registration for fleet vehicles, decal serial numbers and annual registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 05, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2015-03-23 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Lusker as conferees |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |