KS HB2089 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Senate Conference committee report now available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the requirement to report individuals who solicit memberships on behalf of prepaid service plans from semi-annually to annually and upon application for registration and discontinuing payment of annual registration fees for such plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the requirement to report individuals who solicit memberships on behalf of prepaid service plans from semi-annually to annually and upon application for registration and discontinuing payment of annual registration fees for such plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2023-04-27HouseHouse Representative Winn is appointed to replace Representative Poskin on the Conference Committee
2023-04-26HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Landwehr and Representative Poskin appointed as second conferees
2023-04-26SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees
2023-04-26SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2023-04-26SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2023-04-25SenateSenate Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson, and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee
2023-04-25HouseHouse Representative Williams, K., Representative Landwehr, and Representative Poskin are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
2023-03-28SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as conferees
2023-03-27HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor as conferees
2023-03-22SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
2023-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2023-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-03-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2023-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2023-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2023-02-21SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2023-02-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2023-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2023-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
2023-01-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2023-01-19HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/hb2089/
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2089_00_0000.pdf
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2089_01_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_hb2089_s_1651.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2023_hb2089_s_2154.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2023_hb2089_s_2157.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2089_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2089_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2089_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2089_02_42623.pdf
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230221110810_961849/
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230322150859_639847/

Bill Comments

feedback