KS HB2088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the negligent driving violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the negligent driving violation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-01-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-28HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback