KS HB2087 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the review of certain rules and regulations by the director of the budget and requiring review of rules and regulations every five years.
Title
Limiting the review of certain rules and regulations by the director of the budget and requiring review of rules and regulations every five years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 105 Nay: 12 (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 4 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 13 (Y: 109 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 4 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 13 (Y: 109 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Reengrossed on Sunday, April 3, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 105 Nay: 12 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 4 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand, and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys, and Senator Hawk on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. as conferees |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 13 |
2021-02-18 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 17, 2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 1, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |