KS HB2086 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the requirements for offender registration.
Title
Amending the requirements for offender registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |