KS HB2084 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Kansas 911 act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Kansas 911 act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 87 Nay: 35 (Y: 87 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 94 Nay: 29 (Y: 94 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 16, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Reengrossed on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 87 Nay: 35
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 94 Nay: 29
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Amendment by Representative Carmichael was adopted
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Delperdang was adopted
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Delperdang
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
2019-01-24HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2019-01-24HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback