KS HB2083 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring legislative members of the sentencing commission to be members of the senate judiciary and the house corrections and juvenile justice committees.
Title
Requiring legislative members of the sentencing commission to be members of the senate judiciary and the house corrections and juvenile justice committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-20 | House | House Introduced |