KS HB2081 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program; such scholarships based on the recipients of the Kansas teacher of the year award backgrounds and attributes; making and concerning appropriations for the program for fiscal years ending June 30, 2024, June 30, 2025, June 30, 2026, June 30, 2027, and June 30, 2028, for the department of education for such scholarships.
Title
Creating the aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program; such scholarships based on the recipients of the Kansas teacher of the year award backgrounds and attributes; making and concerning appropriations for the program for fiscal years ending June 30, 2024, June 30, 2025, June 30, 2026, June 30, 2027, and June 30, 2028, for the department of education for such scholarships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-19 | House | House Introduced |