KS HB2079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the spousal exception from sexual battery.
Title
Removing the spousal exception from sexual battery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2079/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2079_00_0000.pdf |