KS HB2074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2074 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institution act, providing requirements, fiduciary powers, duties, functions and limitations for such financial institutions and the administration thereof by the state bank commissioner, creating an income and privilege tax credit for certain qualified distributions from technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions and the joint committee on fiduciary financial institutions oversight.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2074 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institution act, providing requirements, fiduciary powers, duties, functions and limitations for such financial institutions and the administration thereof by the state bank commissioner, creating an income and privilege tax credit for certain qualified distributions from technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions and the joint committee on fiduciary financial institutions oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 103 Nay: 20 (Y: 103 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 103 Nay: 20 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman appointed as conferees |
2021-04-07 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Hoheisel and Representative Xu as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-11 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-01-15 | House | House Introduced |