KS HB2071 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the criminal penalties for stalking a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the criminal penalties for stalking a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
2021-04-09HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
2021-04-08HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, April 6, 2021
2021-04-06HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2021-03-25SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2021-03-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-15SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-02-03HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed;
2021-02-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-02-01HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2021-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2071/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2071_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2071_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2071_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2071_h_0849.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2071_s_1713.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2071_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2071_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2071_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hb_2071_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210203123257_598168/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210325150145_204161/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210406143348_923570/

Bill Comments 750

feedback