KS HB2070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designating a portion of United States highway 75 as the John Armstrong memorial highway and a bridge on United States highway 77 as the SGT Kevin A. Gilbertson memorial bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of United States highway 75 as the John Armstrong memorial highway and a bridge on United States highway 77 as the SGT Kevin A. Gilbertson memorial bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 16, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-20SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-20HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-06HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-01-24HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-24HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback