KS HB2068 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2021-03-05HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-01-26HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2021-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-01-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback