KS HB2066 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a property tax exemption for up to two motor vehicles for volunteer firefighters and volunteer emergency medical service providers.
Title
Providing for a property tax exemption for up to two motor vehicles for volunteer firefighters and volunteer emergency medical service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |