KS HB2066 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2066 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Expanding the military spouse and service members expedited licensure law to all applicants who have established or intend to establish residency in Kansas.
Title
Substitute for HB 2066 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Expanding the military spouse and service members expedited licensure law to all applicants who have established or intend to establish residency in Kansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 105 Nay: 17 (Y: 105 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 17 (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 21 (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected - Yea: 44 Nay: 80 (Y: 44 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 17 (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 21 (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected - Yea: 44 Nay: 80 (Y: 44 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 105 Nay: 17 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Alley, Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2021-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Tarwater , Representative Croft and Representative Clayton as conferees |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 2 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 17 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hawk |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hilderbrand |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 103 Nay: 21 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected Yea: 44 Nay: 80 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Croft was adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Croft |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-14 | House | House Introduced |