KS HB2066 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Motion to withdraw from Committee on Public Health and Welfare not adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding medicaid eligibility by enacting the KanCare bridge to a healthy Kansas program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding medicaid eligibility by enacting the KanCare bridge to a healthy Kansas program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to withdraw from Committee on Public Health and Welfare not adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 13 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 69 Nay: 54 (Y: 69 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended - Yea: 70 Nay: 54 (Y: 70 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected - Yea: 55 Nay: 69 (Y: 55 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Williams was rejected - Yea: 55 Nay: 67 (Y: 55 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Humphries was adopted - Yea: 90 Nay: 34 (Y: 90 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was rejected - Yea: 61 Nay: 63 (Y: 61 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wolfe Moore was adopted - Yea: 69 Nay: 53 (Y: 69 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was overruled - Yea: 55 Nay: 62 (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to withdraw from Committee on Public Health and Welfare not adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 13
2019-03-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-22SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 69 Nay: 54
2019-03-21HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, March 21, 2019
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended Yea: 70 Nay: 54
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected Yea: 55 Nay: 69
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Williams was rejected Yea: 55 Nay: 67
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Williams
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Humphries was adopted Yea: 90 Nay: 34
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Humphries
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was rejected Yea: 61 Nay: 63
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Owens
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waymaster was adopted
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waymaster
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wolfe Moore was adopted Yea: 69 Nay: 53
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was overruled Yea: 55 Nay: 62
2019-03-20HouseHouse Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wolfe Moore
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-11HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-01-23HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-01-23HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2066/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2066_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2066_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2066_02_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320124917_593574/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320140927_856507/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320162950_283730/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320163700_600248/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320174346_493006/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320180513_023613/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190320181622_218768/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190321120952_604270/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190501111308_751933/

Bill Comments

feedback