KS HB2062 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Discontinuing the excise tax on rental and leased motor vehicles and imposing property tax on such vehicles.
Title
Discontinuing the excise tax on rental and leased motor vehicles and imposing property tax on such vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-03-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 1, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |