KS HB2060 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 12, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 12, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2060 by Committee on Education - Authorizing payments from the state safety fund to community colleges for the provision of driver's education, authorizing the provision of tools, supplies and examinations to AO-K career pathway program participants and including high school equivalency credentials in performance-based payments for postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2060 by Committee on Education - Authorizing payments from the state safety fund to community colleges for the provision of driver's education, authorizing the provision of tools, supplies and examinations to AO-K career pathway program participants and including high school equivalency credentials in performance-based payments for postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 83 Nay: 39 (Y: 83 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 3 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 83 Nay: 37 (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Winn was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 3 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 83 Nay: 37 (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Winn was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 12, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 39 |
2023-04-27 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 3 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees |
2023-04-04 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Williams, K. , Representative Landwehr and Representative Winn as conferees |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 83 Nay: 37 |
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Winn was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 81 |
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Winn |
2023-02-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |