KS HB2058 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2058 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation – Sales tax exemption for purchases for construction materials for Wichita children's home, the beacon, inc. and reaching out from within, inc.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2058 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation – Sales tax exemption for purchases for construction materials for Wichita children's home, the beacon, inc. and reaching out from within, inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 2 |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-01-23 | House | House Introduced |