KS HB2057 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property taxation, sale or abandonment of personal property before taxes paid, liens, appointment of interim appraisers, homesteads destroyed or substantially destroyed by natural disaster, certain agreements by board of county commissioners; privilege tax, deductions; income tax, credits, modification to Kansas adjusted gross income; liquified petroleum motor fuel law, rates of taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation, sale or abandonment of personal property before taxes paid, liens, appointment of interim appraisers, homesteads destroyed or substantially destroyed by natural disaster, certain agreements by board of county commissioners; privilege tax, deductions; income tax, credits, modification to Kansas adjusted gross income; liquified petroleum motor fuel law, rates of taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-30HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
2014-04-30HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014
2014-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2014-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2014-04-02SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2014-03-31SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2014-03-31HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Carlson , Representative Edmonds and Representative Sawyer as conferees
2014-03-19SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2014-03-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2014-03-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2014-02-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2014-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 25, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2013-03-27SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2013-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2013-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2013-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2013-03-25HouseHouse Representative Brunk raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2013-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple
2013-02-13HouseHouse Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2013-02-12HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2013-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 05, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2013-01-23HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2013-01-23HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback