KS HB2056 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2056 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Changing the time period when advance voting ballots can be returned and regulating the use of remote ballot boxes for the return of such ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2056 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Changing the time period when advance voting ballots can be returned and regulating the use of remote ballot boxes for the return of such ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 17 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 22 Nay: 17 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 97 Nay: 24 (Y: 97 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
2022-04-01SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2022-03-31HouseHouse Representative Bergquist is appointed to replace Representative Arnberger on the Conference Committee
2022-03-29SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
2022-03-28HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Arnberger and Representative Miller as conferees
2022-03-23SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 17
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was adopted
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hilderbrand
2022-03-23SenateSenate Senator Hilderbrand raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher
2022-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2022-03-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2022-01-26SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2021-05-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-05-07SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-05-06HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 97 Nay: 24
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-05-06HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-02-01HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-26HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-01-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-13HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2056/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2056_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2056_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2056_02_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2056_h_0801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2022_hb2056_s_3497.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2056_s_3936.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2056_s_3923.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2022_hb2056_s_4029.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2056_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2056_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2056_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2056_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2056_01_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210506153813_392359/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220324020114_831514/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220402005443_439680/

Bill Comments

feedback