KS HB2054 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2054 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the governmental response to the 2020 COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2054 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the governmental response to the 2020 COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 76 Nay: 34 (Y: 76 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 104 Nay: 9 (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 5 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 102 Nay: 22 (Y: 102 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 40 Nay: 81 (Y: 40 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
2020-05-21HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 22, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 76 Nay: 34
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 11
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2020-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Ward appointed as second conferees
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Rucker and Senator Miller appointed as second conferees
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Rucker and Senator Miller appointed as conferees
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-05-21HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees
2020-05-21HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-03-16SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 5
2020-03-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2020-03-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2020-03-13SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 23
2019-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected
2019-03-25HouseHouse Representative Cox raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected Yea: 40 Nay: 81
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-01-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2054/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2054_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2054_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2054_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2054_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190325123845_282285/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190326112008_182144/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200316190258_257405/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200522063415_870034/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200522075425_318917/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200522141830_925703/

Bill Comments

feedback