KS HB2053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - House Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 3:30 pm in Room 212-N
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-04HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 4, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-01-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback