KS HB2050 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the requirement that certain entities submit certain documents to the division of post audit.
Title
Removing the requirement that certain entities submit certain documents to the division of post audit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 2, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transparency and Ethics |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-11 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 21, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2021-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | House Introduced |