KS HB2048 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional student eligibility under the tax credit for low income students scholarship program and increasing the amount of the tax credit for contributions made pursuant to such program.
Title
Providing additional student eligibility under the tax credit for low income students scholarship program and increasing the amount of the tax credit for contributions made pursuant to such program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-01-17 | House | House Introduced |