KS HB2048 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district plan addressing child sexual abuse; establishing Erin's law.
Title
School district plan addressing child sexual abuse; establishing Erin's law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 34 (Y: 88 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 34 |
2017-02-14 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 13, 2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |