KS HB2047 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of the office of inspector general to the office of the attorney general.
Title
Transfer of the office of inspector general to the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 54 Nay: 68 (Y: 54 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 54 Nay: 68 (Y: 54 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 27, 2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected Yea: 54 Nay: 68 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Holscher was rejected |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Holscher |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-14 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be amended and the bill be referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |