KS HB2045 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising two tax credits - first by updating the Kansas angel investor tax credit act with respect to the definition of qualified securities, tax credit limitations and amounts, investor requirements and extending the date that credits may be allowed, and second by increasing the tax credit for expenses incurred to make a residence accessible to persons with a disability.
Title
Revising two tax credits - first by updating the Kansas angel investor tax credit act with respect to the definition of qualified securities, tax credit limitations and amounts, investor requirements and extending the date that credits may be allowed, and second by increasing the tax credit for expenses incurred to make a residence accessible to persons with a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 112 Nay: 11 (Y: 112 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 11 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Toplikar was adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Toplikar |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 13, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 7, 2021 |