KS HB2041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the judicial branch surcharge fund; also requiring the responsible party to pay for the cost of collection services for debts owed to courts or restitution.
Title
Extending the judicial branch surcharge fund; also requiring the responsible party to pay for the cost of collection services for debts owed to courts or restitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 24 (Y: 98 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 15 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 15 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 24 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 15 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-03 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-03 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |