KS HB2039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Engrossed on Sunday, April 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating laws concerning limited liability companies; exempting animal shelters from registration requirements as charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating laws concerning limited liability companies; exempting animal shelters from registration requirements as charitable organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Engrossed on Sunday, April 7, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Rucker and Senator Miller appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-07SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-07HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2019-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hearing continuation: Monday, January 28, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-01-24HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 24, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-01-17HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback