KS HB2034 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the supported decision-making agreements act to provide a statutory framework for adults who want decision-making assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the supported decision-making agreements act to provide a statutory framework for adults who want decision-making assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 15 (Y: 101 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-11SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-08HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 7, 2019
2019-02-08HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 15
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-04HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-01-24HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 24, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-01-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback