KS HB2032 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing fees credited to the state water plan fund.
Title
Increasing fees credited to the state water plan fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Water and Environment; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2017-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2032/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2032_00_0000.pdf |