KS HB2023 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2023 by Committee on Commerce - enacting the public service benefits protection act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2023 by Committee on Commerce - enacting the public service benefits protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 68 Nay: 56 (Y: 68 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 68 Nay: 56 (Y: 68 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 01, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 05, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-01-31 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 68 Nay: 56 |
2013-01-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-01-28 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-01-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 23, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-01-17 | House | House Introduced |