KS HB2023 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 28 March 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 28 March 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the drug schedule by adding additional unlawful substances.
Title
Amending the drug schedule by adding additional unlawful substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Approved by Governor on Monday, 28 March 2011 | |
2011-03-28 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Reengrossed on Monday, 21 March 2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 24 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-11 | Engrossed on Thursday, 10 February 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-10 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-09 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-09 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced |