KS HB2020 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office to submit an initial application for a VA state veterans home construction grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office to submit an initial application for a VA state veterans home construction grant.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military
2021-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
2021-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2021-01-11HouseHouse Introduced
2021-01-11HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 31, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback