KS HB2020 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - House Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Changing the supreme court clerk's information requirements for licensed attorneys and changing procedures related to the supreme court nominating commission and the judicial district nominating commissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the supreme court clerk's information requirements for licensed attorneys and changing procedures related to the supreme court nominating commission and the judicial district nominating commissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 10, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback