KS HB2018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Creating the Kansas criminal justice reform commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Creating the Kansas criminal justice reform commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
2019-03-25HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-03-12HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2019-01-24HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 10, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback